Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/06/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/10/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/10/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/10/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/10/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/10/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/10/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/12/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/12/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/18/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/21/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/24/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/25/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/26/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/01/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/04/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/30/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/01/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/13/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/20/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/28/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/02/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/09/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/19/2014