Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/25/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/26/2013