Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/28/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/31/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/29/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2014