Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/14/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/04/2013