Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/28/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/26/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/22/2014