There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Prison Bureau Nonviolent Offender Relief Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide an alternate release date for certain nonviolent offenders, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/25/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/10/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/25/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.62.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.62. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2013)

Federal Prison Bureau Nonviolent Offender Relief Act of 2013 - Amends the federal criminal code to direct the Bureau of Prisons, pursuant to a good time policy, to release a prisoner who has served one half or more of his or her term of imprisonment if that prisoner: (1) has attained age 45; (2) has never been convicted of a crime of violence; and (3) has not engaged in any violation, involving violent conduct, of institutional disciplinary regulations.