Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/27/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/27/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/28/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/18/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 06/26/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 06/11/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/11/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/25/2014