Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/10/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/19/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/26/2013