Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 02/14/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/14/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 02/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/14/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/15/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/15/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/15/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/15/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/15/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/15/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/05/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 03/05/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/05/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/14/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/30/2013