Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/07/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/26/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/27/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/05/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 02/10/2014