Text: H.R.64 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 64


To increase the number of Federal air marshals for certain flights, require criminal investigative training for such marshals, create an office and appoint an ombudsman for the marshals, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 3, 2013

Ms. Jackson Lee introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Homeland Security


A BILL

To increase the number of Federal air marshals for certain flights, require criminal investigative training for such marshals, create an office and appoint an ombudsman for the marshals, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “FAMS Augmentation Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Increase in the number of Federal air marshals.

(a) Increase in number of Federal air marshals.—Not later than September 30, 2014, and in accordance with subsection (b), the Assistant Secretary (Transportation Security Administration) shall increase the number of Federal air marshals so that not less than 1,750 additional Federal air marshals are hired and deployed, above the number of such marshals as of January 31, 2011, to ensure increased transportation security for inbound international flights.

(b) Congressional intent.—The goal of this Act is to increase the number of inbound flights with Federal air marshals onboard while maintaining Federal air marshal presence on domestic point-to-point flights at or above the level as of December 25, 2009.

SEC. 3. Training of Federal air marshals.

Section 44917 of title 49, United States Code, is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(e) Criminal investigative training program.—

“(1) NEW EMPLOYEE TRAINING.—Not later than 30 days after the date of enactment of the FAMS Augmentation Act of 2013, the Federal Air Marshal Service shall establish a policy requiring Federal air marshals hired after such date to complete the criminal investigative training program at the Federal Law Enforcement Training Center as part of basic training for Federal air marshals.

“(2) EXISTING EMPLOYEES.—A Federal air marshal who has previously completed the criminal investigative training program may not be required to repeat such program.

“(3) ALTERNATIVE TRAINING.—Not later than 3 years after the date of enactment of the FAMS Augmentation Act of 2013, an air marshal hired before such date who has not completed the criminal investigative training program shall be required to attend an alternative training program, as determined by the Director of the Federal Law Enforcement Center, that provides the training necessary to bridge the gap between the mixed basic police training, the Federal air marshal programs already completed by the Federal air marshal, and the criminal investigative training provided through the criminal investigative training program. Any such alternative program shall be considered to have met the standards of the criminal investigative training program.

“(4) RESERVATION OF FUNDS.—Of the amounts to be appropriated pursuant to section 6 of the FAMS Augmentation Act of 2013, $3,000,000 may be used to carry out this subsection for each of fiscal years 2013 and 2014.

“(5) SAVINGS CLAUSE.—Nothing in this subsection shall be construed to reclassify Federal air marshals as criminal investigators.”.

SEC. 4. Ombudsman.

Section 44917 of title 49, United States Code, is further amended by adding at the end the following:

“(f) Ombudsman.—

“(1) ESTABLISHMENT.—The Assistant Secretary shall establish in the Federal Air Marshal Service an Office of the Ombudsman.

“(2) APPOINTMENT.—The head of the Office shall be the Ombudsman, who shall be appointed by the Assistant Secretary.

“(3) DUTIES.—The Ombudsman shall carry out programs and activities to improve morale, training, and quality of life issues in the Service, including through implementation of the recommendations of the Inspector General of the Department of Homeland Security and the Comptroller General.

“(4) CAREER RESERVED POSITION.—The position of Ombudsman shall be treated as a career reserved position, as defined by section 3132(a)(8) of title 5, United States Code.

“(5) RESERVATION OF FUNDS.—Of the amounts to be appropriated pursuant to section 6 of the FAMS Augmentation Act of 2013, $1,000,000 may be used to carry out this subsection for each of fiscal years 2013 and 2014.”.

SEC. 5. Reports.

(a) Reports.—Beginning 6 months after the date of enactment of this Act and every 6 months thereafter, until the Department has increased, by not less than an additional 1,750, the number of Federal air marshals the Assistant Secretary shall submit a report to the Committee on Homeland Security of the House of Representatives and the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation of the Senate on the progress of increasing the number of Federal air marshals under this Act, adopting the alternative criminal investigative training program, and implementing an ombudsman program for such marshals.

(b) Report summary.—The report shall include a summary of disciplinary personnel actions implemented against Federal air marshals by the Department of Homeland Security and complaints and lawsuits filed by Federal air marshals against the Department or its agents.

SEC. 6. Authorization of appropriations.

There are authorized to be appropriated to carry out this Act and subsections (d) and (e) of section 44917 of title 49, United States Code, $190,000,000 for fiscal year 2013 and $172,000,000 for fiscal year 2014.