Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/10/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/10/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/17/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 11/13/2014