There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equal Employment for All Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Credit Reporting Act to prohibit the use of consumer credit checks against prospective and current employees for the purposes of making adverse employment decisions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/13/2013Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/18/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/13/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.645. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2013)

Equal Employment for All Act - Amends the Fair Credit Reporting Act to prohibit a current or prospective employer from using a consumer report or an investigative consumer report, or from causing one to be procured, for either employment purposes or for making an adverse action, if the report contains information that bears upon the consumer's creditworthiness, credit standing, or credit capacity.

Makes exceptions to such prohibition for employment: (1) which requires a national security or Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (FDIC) clearance; (2) with a state or local government agency which otherwise requires use of a consumer report; or (3) in a supervisory, managerial, professional, or executive position at a financial institution.