Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/27/2014