Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/25/2013