There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Grazing Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Grazing Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 to improve the management of grazing leases and permits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/09/2013Committee on Agriculture discharged.
07/09/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-145, Part I.
02/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
07/09/2013Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 105.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2013Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/09/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-145, Part I.
06/12/2013Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 15.
06/12/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/12/2013Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
04/18/2013Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
03/01/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/22/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/13/2013Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2013Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/13/2013 Referred to
06/12/2013 Markup by
07/09/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-145
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation02/22/2013 Referred to
04/18/2013 Hearings by
06/12/2013 Discharged from
House Agriculture02/13/2013 Referred to
07/09/2013 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry03/01/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.657. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (07/09/2013)

Grazing Improvement Act - Amends the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 (the Act) to double from 10 to 20 years the period of a term for grazing permits and leases for domestic livestock grazing on public lands or lands within national forests in 16 contiguous western states. Permits the issuance of permits and leases for a period shorter than 20 years (under current law, shorter than 10 years), including where the Secretary concerned determines that the initial environmental analysis under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA) regarding a grazing allotment, permit, or lease has not been completed.

Permits only applicants, permittees, and lessees whose interest in grazing livestock is directly affected by a final grazing decision to appeal such decision to an administrative law judge.

Directs that grazing permits or leases issued by the Secretary of the Interior respecting lands under the jurisdiction of the Department of the Interior and grazing permits issued by the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) respecting National Forest System lands that expire, are transferred, or are waived after this Act's enactment be renewed or reissued, as appropriate, under the Act, the Granger-Thye Act, the Bankhead-Jones Farm Tenant Act, or the California Desert Protection Act of 1994.

Excludes the renewal, reissuance, or transfer of a grazing permit or lease by the Secretary concerned from the NEPA requirement to prepare an environmental analysis if: (1) such decision continues to renew, reissue, or transfer current grazing management of the allotment; (2) monitoring indicates that such management meets objectives contained in the land use and resource management plan of the allotment; or (3) the decision is consistent with the policy of the Department of the Interior or USDA regarding extraordinary circumstances.

Gives the Secretary concerned the sole discretion to determine the priority and timing for completing each required environmental analysis regarding any grazing allotment, permit, or lease based on the environmental significance of such authorization and available funding.

Makes NEPA inapplicable to domestic livestock crossing and trailing authorizations, transfers of grazing preference, and range improvements.