Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/04/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/24/2013