Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/19/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013