Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-75.
01/16/2014 Signed by President.
01/09/2014 Presented to President.
01/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
01/08/2014 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S185)
02/25/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 0, 1 Present (Roll no. 47).(text: CR H602)
02/13/2013 Introduced in House