There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ruth Moore Act of 2013

Short Titles as Reported to House

Ruth Moore Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Ruth Moore Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress an annual report on claims for disabilities incurred or aggravated by military sexual trauma, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the disability compensation evaluation procedure of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for veterans with mental health conditions related to military sexual trauma, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/04/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3029-3030)
05/17/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 113-63.
02/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
06/06/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/04/2013-12:53pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/04/2013-12:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/2013-12:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3029-3030)
06/04/2013-12:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 671.
06/04/2013-12:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3029-3032)
06/04/2013-12:37pmHouseMr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/17/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 38.
05/17/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 113-63.
05/08/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/08/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/25/2013HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
04/25/2013HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
04/16/2013HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
03/01/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/13/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/13/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/16/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/13/2013 Referred to
05/08/2013 Markup by
05/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-63
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/01/2013 Referred to
04/16/2013 Hearings by
04/25/2013 Markup by
04/25/2013 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/06/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.671. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/04/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 17, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Ruth Moore Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report to Congress in each of 2014 through 2018 on claims submitted for disabilities based on a covered mental health condition alleged to have been incurred or aggravated by military sexual trauma during active duty. Includes as a covered mental health condition post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD), anxiety, depression, or any other mental health diagnosis that the Secretary determines to be related to military sexual trauma.

Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary should update and improve VA regulations with respect to military sexual trauma by: (1) ensuring that it is specified as an in-service stressor in determining the service-connection of PTSD, and (2) recognizing the full range of physical and mental disabilities that can result from such trauma. Requires each veteran submitting such a claim to be provided the most recently updated regulations concerning such trauma, as well as other information designed to aid such claims.

Extends until FY2019 the required rounding to the nearest dollar of VA basic educational assistance and survivors' and dependents' educational assistance.