Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/16/2013