Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/21/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/25/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/26/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/04/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2013