Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 01/29/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/25/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/29/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/15/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/17/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew