Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/06/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/14/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/03/2014