Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/26/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/10/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/10/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/25/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/20/2014