Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/25/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/07/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/24/2013