Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/26/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/16/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/08/2014