Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/24/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/20/2014