Refine your search

6 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
05/23/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-105.
05/23/2014 Signed by President.
05/21/2014 Presented to President.
05/20/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3192)
05/19/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 0 (Roll no. 219).(text: CR H4456)
02/14/2013 Introduced in House