Refine your search

Showing 28 of 28 total for All Actions.
Date All Actions
09/26/2013-3:35pm Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 687 as unfinished business.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-3:35pm On motion the the Committee now rise Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-3:35pm Mr. Hastings (WA) moved the the Committee now rise.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:58pm UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:57pm POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Napolitano amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Napolitano demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:49pm DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 351, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Napolitano Part A amendment No. 3.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:48pm POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Ben Ray Lujan (NM) amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Ben Ray Lujan (NM) demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:36pm DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 351, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ben Ray Lujan (NM) Part A amendment No. 2.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:35pm POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Grijalva amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Grijalva demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-2:27pm DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 351, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Grijalva Part A amendment No. 1.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-1:34pm GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 687.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-1:34pm The Speaker designated the Honorable Lee Terry to act as Chairman of the Committee.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-1:33pm House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 351 and Rule XVIII.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-1:32pm Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 687, H.R. 1526 and H.R. 3102. Measures will be considered read.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-1:32pm Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 351. (consideration: CR H5848-5863; text of an amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H5854-5856)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2013-9:32pm Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 351 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 687, H.R. 1526 and H.R. 3102. Measures will be considered read.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2013 Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-167.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
05/15/2013 Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 19.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
05/15/2013 Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
05/15/2013 Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
05/15/2013 Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
03/21/2013 Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
02/21/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/21/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
02/14/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013 Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives