There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Credit Union Small Business Jobs Creation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Credit Union Act to provide certain credit unions with the authority to make additional member business loans, and for other purposes.

Actions Overview (1)

02/14/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

02/14/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (121)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 02/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/26/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/26/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 02/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/27/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/27/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/27/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/27/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/28/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/04/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/06/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/26/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/26/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/11/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/16/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/07/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 02/25/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/24/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/14/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Banking and financial institutions regulation
  • Congressional oversight
  • Credit and credit markets
  • National Credit Union Administration

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.688. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2013)

Credit Union Small Business Jobs Creation Act - Amends the Federal Credit Union Act to prohibit an insured credit union from making any member business loan that would result in the total amount of such loans outstanding at that credit union at any one time exceeding either: (1) 1.75 times the actual net worth of the credit union, or (2) 12.25% of the total assets of the credit union.

Authorizes the National Credit Union Administration Board to approve an application by an insured credit union to make one or more member business loans that would result in a total amount of such loans outstanding at any one time of up to 27.5 % of the total assets of the credit union, if the credit union meets specified safety and soundness criteria. Prohibits an insured credit union that has made such a member business loan but that is not well capitalized from making any new member business loans until it becomes well capitalized and obtains Board approval.

Directs the Board to develop a tiered approval process, including lending standards, under which an insured credit union gradually increases the amount of member business lending in a manner consistent with safe and sound operations.

Directs the Comptroller General to study the status of member business lending by insured credit unions.