Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/26/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 02/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/27/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/10/2013