Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 08/01/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/09/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/29/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/15/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/15/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/15/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/15/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/15/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/15/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/24/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/24/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/24/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/30/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/31/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/31/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/31/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 08/01/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 08/01/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/01/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/18/2014