Committees: H.R.697 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/14/2013 Referred to
06/12/2013 Markup by
07/08/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-137
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation02/27/2013 Referred to
06/12/2013 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/27/2013 Referred to
03/21/2013 Hearings by
06/12/2013 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/23/2013 Referred to
11/21/2013 Markup by
04/08/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-147