There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Short Titles as Introduced

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish safeguards and standards of quality for research and transplantation of organs infected with human immunodeficiency virus (HIV).


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/30/2013Committee on Judiciary discharged.
07/30/2013Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-181, Part I.
02/14/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
07/30/2013Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 129.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013Committee on Judiciary discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2013Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-181, Part I.
07/17/2013Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/17/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/16/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/21/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/08/2013
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/10/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/19/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/24/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 06/24/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2013
Del. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2013 Referred to
07/17/2013 Markup by
07/30/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-181
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/15/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary02/14/2013 Referred to
07/30/2013 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/08/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.698. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment, Part I (07/30/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

HIV Organ Policy Equity Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to repeal the requirement that the Organ Procurement and Transplantation Network adopt and use standards of quality for the acquisition and transportation of donated organs that include standards for preventing the acquisition of organs infected with the etiologic agent for acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS).

Replaces this requirement with authorization for the Network to adopt and use such standards with respect to organs infected with human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), provided that any such standards ensure that organs infected with HIV may be transplanted only into individuals who are infected with such virus before receiving such an organ.

Revises similarly the requirement that organ procurement organizations arrange for testing to prevent the acquisition of organs infected with the AIDS etiologic agent to require that they arrange for testing to identify organs infected with HIV.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop and publish guidelines for the conduct of research relating to transplantation of organs from HIV-infected donors.

Requires the Network to revise its standards of quality regarding HIV-infected organs and the Secretary to revise related regulations.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) review annually the results of scientific research in conjunction with the Network to determine whether they warrant revision of quality standards relating to donated HIV-infected organs and to the safety of cross-strain transplantation; and (2) direct the Network, if the review so warrants, to revise its standards in a way that ensures the changes will not reduce the safety of organ transplantation.

Amends the federal criminal code to declare that an organ donation does not violate the prohibition against a knowing organ donation by an HIV-infected individual if the donation is made in accordance with this Act.