Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/21/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/03/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/03/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/05/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/10/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/11/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/14/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/19/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/24/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/24/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 06/24/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/27/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/18/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2013