Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/14/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/15/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/07/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/10/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/15/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 01/15/2014