Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/26/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/06/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/06/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/17/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/17/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/01/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/04/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/04/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/11/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/26/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/18/2014