Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 03/04/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/18/2013