Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/15/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/04/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/12/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/04/2013