Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/07/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/20/2014