Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/12/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/19/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/23/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/05/2013