Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/25/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/22/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/22/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/22/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/28/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/04/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/04/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/04/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/04/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/04/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/14/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/14/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/25/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/25/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/09/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/08/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2014