Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/25/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2014