Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/25/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/07/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/07/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/14/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/21/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/03/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/03/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/15/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/15/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/15/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/23/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/28/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/28/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/10/2014