Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/16/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/18/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/16/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/27/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/27/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/09/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/11/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/26/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/26/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/26/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/26/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/28/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/28/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/08/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/11/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/16/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 12/03/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/10/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 01/07/2014