There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Real Education for Healthy Youth Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the reduction of unintended pregnancy and sexually transmitted infections, including HIV, and the promotion of healthy relationships, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/23/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/23/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/07/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/17/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/01/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/16/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/13/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/15/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce02/14/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education04/23/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training04/23/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.725. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2013)

Real Education for Healthy Youth Act of 2013 - Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to award competitive grants to enable eligible entities to carry out programs that provide adolescents with comprehensive sex education to: (1) replicate evidence-based sex education programs, (2) substantially incorporate elements of evidence-based sex education programs, or (3) create a demonstration project based on generally accepted characteristics of effective sex education programs. Sets forth provisions regarding evaluation of such programs. Requires the Secretary to establish a common set of performance measures to assess the implementation and impact of grant programs funded under this Act.

Requires the Secretary to award competitive grants to: (1) institutions of higher education to enable such institutions to provide young people with comprehensive sex education with an emphasis on reducing HIV, other sexually transmitted infections, and unintended pregnancy; and (2) eligible entities to train targeted faculty and staff in order to increase effective teaching of comprehensive sex education for elementary and secondary school students.

Prohibits programs funded under this Act from discriminating on the basis of actual or perceived sex, race, color, ethnicity, national origin, disability, sexual orientation, gender identity, or religion.

Prohibits federal funds provided under this Act from being used for health education programs that: (1) deliberately withhold life-saving information about HIV; (2) are medically inaccurate or have been scientifically shown to be ineffective; (3) promote gender stereotypes; (4) are insensitive and unresponsive to the needs of sexually active youth or lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender youth; or (5) are inconsistent with the ethical imperatives of medicine and public health.

Amends the Public Health Service Act to repeal a prohibition against the use of appropriations for AIDS prevention programs to provide education or information designed to promote or encourage, directly, homosexual or heterosexual activity or intravenous substance abuse.

Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to repeal a prohibition against the use of authorized funds to operate a program of contraceptive distribution in schools.