Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/07/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 06/17/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 07/11/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/01/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/16/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/13/2014