There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Access to Birth Control Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish certain duties for pharmacies to ensure provision of Food and Drug Administration-approved contraception, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/14/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E148)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/28/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/11/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/01/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/14/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.728. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2013)

Access to Birth Control Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require pharmacies to comply with certain rules related to contraceptives, including: (1) providing a customer a contraceptive without delay if it is in stock; (2) immediately informing a customer if the contraceptive is not in stock and either transferring the prescription to a pharmacy that has the contraceptive in stock or expediting the ordering of the contraceptive and notifying the customer when it arrives, based on customer preference, except for pharmacies that do not ordinarily stock contraceptives in the normal course of business; and (3) ensuring that pharmacy employees do not take certain actions relating to a request for contraception, including intimidating, threatening, or harassing customers, interfering with or obstructing the delivery of services, intentionally misrepresenting or deceiving customers about the availability of contraception or its mechanism of action, breaching or threatening to breach medical confidentiality, or refusing to return a valid, lawful prescription.

Provides that a pharmacy is not prohibited from refusing to provide a contraceptive to a customer if: (1) it is unlawful to dispense the contraceptive to the customer without a valid, lawful prescription and no such prescription is presented; (2) the customer is unable to pay for the contraceptive; or (3) the employee of the pharmacy refuses to provide the contraceptive on the basis of a professional clinical judgment.

Provides that this Act does not preempt state law or any professional obligation of a state board that provides greater protections for customers.

Sets forth civil penalties and establishes a a private cause of action for violations of this Act.