Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/28/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/11/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 10/04/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/01/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2014